US SB1881 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-11 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-11 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
(Sec. 2) makes certain veterans eligible for the Transportation Security Administration PreCheck Program at no cost if they meet the program's background check and security requirements. Veterans who are eligible for this fee waiver are those who require the use of a wheelchair, prosthetic limb, or other assistive device to aid with mobility due to (1) loss, or loss of use, of a limb; (2) full or partial paralyzation; or (3) permanent blindness.
Title
VETS Safe Travel Act Veterans Expedited TSA Screening Safe Travel Act
Sponsors
Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-11 | House | Held at the desk. |
2019-09-11 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5411) |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5411) |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3356 (Related) 2019-09-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 160.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Aviation and airports
Congressional oversight
Disability and paralysis
Disability assistance
Transportation safety and security
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Aviation and airports
Congressional oversight
Disability and paralysis
Disability assistance
Transportation safety and security
Veterans' pensions and compensation