US SB1887 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 299.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 299.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Direct Hire of Students and Recent Graduates Act of 2017
Title
Direct Hire of Students and Recent Graduates Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 299. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments. With written report No. 115-205. |
2017-10-04 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
SB2987 (Related) 2018-06-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 439.
SB2987 (Related) 2018-06-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 439.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Employee hiring
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Higher education
Temporary and part-time employment
Employee hiring
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Higher education
Temporary and part-time employment