US SB1895 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 133.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Lower Health Care Costs Act This bill makes a series of changes relating to health care coverage, costs, and services. Among other things, the bill applies in-network cost-sharing requirements to certain emergency and related nonemergency services that are provided out-of-network, and prohibits health care facilities and practitioners from billing above the applicable in-network cost-sharing rate for such services; revises certain requirements in order to expedite the approval of generics and biosimilars, including requirements relating to citizen petitions, application effective dates, and labeling; requires health care facilities and practitioners to give patients a list of provided services upon discharge and to bill for such services within 45 days; limits prices that pharmacy benefit managers (PBMs) may charge health insurers or enrollees for prescription drugs, based on prices paid by PBMs to pharmacies; establishes grant programs to support vaccinations and data modernization; and requires health insurers to make certain information, including estimated out-of-pocket costs, accessible to enrollees through specified technology (e.g., mobile applications). The bill also makes several additional changes relating to public health, including raising the minimum age to purchase tobacco products from 18 to 21.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lower Health Care Costs Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 133.
2019-07-08SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2019-06-26SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2019-06-19SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Same As/Similar To

HB2011 (Related) 2019-04-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB192 (Related) 2019-01-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB659 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1140 (Related) 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1618 (Related) 2019-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1619 (Related) 2019-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1636 (Related) 2019-05-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1793 (Related) 2019-06-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3365)
SB1805 (Related) 2019-06-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1897 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB965 (Related) 2019-05-16 - Supplemental report filed by the Committee on the Judiciary, H. Rept. 116-55, Part III.
HB2296 (Related) 2019-09-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 170.
SB1391 (Related) 2019-05-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB4215 (Related) 2019-09-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4400 (Related) 2019-09-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5199 (Related) 2019-11-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5304 (Related) 2019-12-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5386 (Related) 2019-12-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5444 (Related) 2019-12-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5668 (Related) 2020-01-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB6005 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB6155 (Related) 2020-03-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.

Subjects

Aviation and airports
Blood and blood diseases
Child health
Civil actions and liability
Competition and antitrust
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Disability and health-based discrimination
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Education programs funding
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Home and outpatient care
Immunology and vaccination
Indian social and development programs
Intellectual property
Licensing and registrations
Medical education
Mental health
Minority health
Nursing
Nutrition and diet
Physical fitness and lifestyle
Prescription drugs
Public participation and lobbying
Public-private cooperation
Right of privacy
Women's health

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback