US SB1917 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the system for the public financing of presidential primary and general elections. The bill (1) eliminates spending limits on participating candidates, (2) increases the amount of matching funds for participating candidates by matching the first $200 of contributions by individuals to candidates at a 6:1 ratio, (3) requires participating candidates to agree to accept contributions of no more than $1,000, and (4) allows national parties to expend up to $100 million in coordination with participating candidates.
Title
Empower Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
HB4053 (Related) 2019-08-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4053 (Related) 2019-08-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government operations and politics
Government trust funds
Political parties and affiliation
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Government operations and politics
Government trust funds
Political parties and affiliation
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/1917/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s1917/BILLS-116s1917is.pdf |