US SB192 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes several health care, research, and workforce programs through FY2024. Specifically, the bill reauthorizes the Community Health Center Fund, which provides enhanced funding for community health centers and the National Health Service Corps; payments to teaching health centers that operate graduate medical-education programs; the Special Diabetes Program, which is administered by the National Institutes of Health; and the Special Diabetes Program for Indians, which is administered by the Indian Health Service.
Title
Community and Public Health Programs Extension Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1943 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB2668 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB2680 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB2700 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
SB1895 (Related) 2019-07-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 133.
HB4378 (Related) 2019-09-27 - Became Public Law No: 116-59. (TXT | PDF)
HB3055 (Related) 2019-11-21 - Became Public Law No: 116-69. (TXT | PDF)
HB2668 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB2680 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB2700 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
SB1895 (Related) 2019-07-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 133.
HB4378 (Related) 2019-09-27 - Became Public Law No: 116-59. (TXT | PDF)
HB3055 (Related) 2019-11-21 - Became Public Law No: 116-69. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Appropriations
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Education programs funding
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Indian social and development programs
Medical education
Minority health
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Education programs funding
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Indian social and development programs
Medical education
Minority health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/192/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s192/BILLS-116s192is.pdf |