US SB1924 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to prevent the purchase of ammunition by prohibited purchasers.
Title
Jaime’s Law
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1705 (Same As) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB8 (Related) 2019-03-04 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 29.
SB42 (Related) 2019-01-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB8 (Related) 2019-03-04 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 29.
SB42 (Related) 2019-01-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Criminal justice information and records
Firearms and explosives
Licensing and registrations
Retail and wholesale trades
Crime prevention
Criminal justice information and records
Firearms and explosives
Licensing and registrations
Retail and wholesale trades
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/1924/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s1924/BILLS-116s1924is.pdf |