US SB1940 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-1)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Internal Revenue Code to permit legally married same sex couples to amend their tax returns to file as married filing jointly for returns outside of the statute of limitations.
Title
Refund Equality Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3294 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1244 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3299 (Related) 2019-07-25 - Received in the Senate.
SB515 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1244 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3299 (Related) 2019-07-25 - Received in the Senate.
SB515 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Marriage and family status
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/1940/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s1940/BILLS-116s1940is.pdf |