US SB1976 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-29 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 499.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-29 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 499.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the FAST Act to improve the Federal permitting process, and for other purposes.
Title
Federal Permitting Reform and Jobs Act
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 499. |
2020-07-29 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-241. |
2019-07-24 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3671 (Same As) 2019-07-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC)
Historic sites and heritage areas
Historical and cultural resources
Infrastructure development
Judicial review and appeals
Licensing and registrations
Performance measurement
Congressional oversight
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC)
Historic sites and heritage areas
Historical and cultural resources
Infrastructure development
Judicial review and appeals
Licensing and registrations
Performance measurement