US SB199 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 126.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A bill to authorize the use of the active capacity of the Fontenelle Reservoir. (Sec. 1) This bill authorizes the Department of the Interior, in cooperation with the state of Wyoming, to amend the Definite Plan Report for the Seedskadee Project (authorized under the Colorado River Storage Project Act) to provide for the study, design, planning, and construction activities that will enable the use of all active storage capacity of Fontenelle Dam and Reservoir, including the placement of sufficient riprap on the upstream face of the dam to allow such storage capacity to be used for authorized project purposes. Interior may enter into: (1) any contract, grant, cooperative agreement, or other agreement that is necessary to carry out this bill; and (2) contracts with Wyoming for division of any additional active capacity made available under this bill. Interior must enter into a cooperative agreement with Wyoming for planning, design, related preconstruction activities, and construction of any modification of the Fontenelle Dam, which shall specify the responsibilities of Interior and Wyoming regarding: (1) completing the planning and final design of the modification of the dam, (2) any environmental and cultural resource compliance activities required for the modification of the dam, and (3) the construction of the modification of the dam.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill to authorize the use of the active capacity of the Fontenelle Reservoir.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-08SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 126.
2017-06-08SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-96.
2017-03-30SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2017-01-24SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Same As/Similar To

HB648 (Related) 2018-04-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 390.
SB2800 (Related) 2018-07-10 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 115-294.
SB3021 (Related) 2018-10-23 - Became Public Law No: 115-270.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback