US SB199 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Leech Lake Band of Ojibwe Reservation Restoration Act This bill directs the Department of Agriculture to transfer to the administrative jurisdiction of the Department of the Interior all right, title, and interest of the United States in and to approximately 11,760 acres of identified federal land in the Chippewa National Forest in Cass County, Minnesota. Immediately upon transfer, the federal land shall be held in trust for the benefit of the Leech Lake Band of Ojibwe and considered as a part of its reservation. The federal land shall not become eligible or be used for gaming activities under the Indian Gaming Regulatory Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Leech Lake Band of Ojibwe Reservation Restoration Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-03HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
2019-07-03HouseReferred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
2019-06-28HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-06-28HouseReceived in the House.
2019-06-28SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-06-27SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S4652-4664; text: CR S4664)
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 33.
2019-03-07SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 116-3.
2019-01-29SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2019-01-24SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB733 (Same As) 2019-06-05 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback