US SB2053 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses election security through grant programs and requirements for voting systems and paper ballots. The bill establishes requirements for voting systems, including that systems (1) use individual, durable, voter-verified paper ballots; (2) make a voter's marked ballot available for inspection and verification by the voter before the vote is cast; (3) ensure that individuals with disabilities are given an equivalent opportunity to vote, including with privacy and independence, in a manner that produces a voter-verified paper ballot; (4) be manufactured in the United States; and (5) meet specified cybersecurity requirements, including the prohibition of the connection of a voting system to the internet. The National Science Foundation must award grants to study, test, and develop accessible voter-verified paper ballot voting and best practices to enhance the accessibility of such voting for individuals with disabilities, for voters whose primary language is not English, and for voters with difficulties in literacy. The Election Assistance Commission (EAC) must award grants to states to replace certain voting systems, carry out voting system security improvements, and implement and model best practices for ballot design, ballot instructions, and the testing of ballots. States must carry out postelection risk-limiting audits for all federal elections, funded by the EAC. States may use elections requirements payments from the EAC to carry out activities related to election security. The EAC must provide for the testing of voting system hardware and software and decertify such technology that does not meet guidelines.
Title
SAFE Act Securing America’s Federal Elections Act
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2722 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
HB2660 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1540 (Related) 2019-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB2652 (Related) 2019-05-09 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SB2238 (Related) 2019-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
HB2660 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1540 (Related) 2019-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB2652 (Related) 2019-05-09 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SB2238 (Related) 2019-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Adult education and literacy
Advisory bodies
Buy American requirements
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional elections
Congressional oversight
Disability and paralysis
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Hearing, speech, and vision care
Internet and video services
Manufacturing
Public contracts and procurement
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Right of privacy
State and local government operations
Technology assessment
Telephone and wireless communication
Voting rights
Adult education and literacy
Advisory bodies
Buy American requirements
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional elections
Congressional oversight
Disability and paralysis
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Hearing, speech, and vision care
Internet and video services
Manufacturing
Public contracts and procurement
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Right of privacy
State and local government operations
Technology assessment
Telephone and wireless communication
Voting rights
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/2053/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s2053/BILLS-116s2053is.pdf |