US SB2054 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-16 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-16 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the President pro tempore of the Senate to arrange for the posthumous award of a Congressional Gold Medal to commemorate Glen Doherty, Tyrone Woods, J. Christopher Stevens, and Sean Smith, four Americans killed in the September 11, 2012, attack on the U.S. consulate in Benghazi, Libya. (Stevens was the U.S. Ambassador to Libya at the time, Smith was an officer in the Foreign Service, and Doherty and Woods were both government contractors and former Navy SEALs.) After the medal has been awarded, it shall be given to the Central Intelligence Agency Museum.
Title
A bill to posthumously award the Congressional Gold Medal, collectively, to Glen Doherty, Tyrone Woods, J. Christopher Stevens, and Sean Smith, in recognition of their contributions to the Nation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-16 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-12-16 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-15 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S7508-7509) |
2020-12-15 | Senate | S.Amdt.2692 Amendment SA 2692 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-12-15 | Senate | S.Amdt.2692 Amendment SA 2692 proposed by Senator Sasse for Senator Markey. (consideration: CR S7508-7509; text: CR S7508-7509) In the nature of a substitute. |
2020-12-15 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7508-7509) |
2020-12-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-12-07 | Senate | S.Amdt.2692 Referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB587 (Same As) 2019-01-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Subjects
Africa
Congressional tributes
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
Law enforcement officers
Libya
Middle East
Terrorism
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Congressional tributes
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
Law enforcement officers
Libya
Middle East
Terrorism
Veterans' organizations and recognition