US SB2072 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Veterans Affairs to increase, as of December 1, 2019, the rates of veterans' disability compensation, additional compensation for dependents, the clothing allowance for certain disabled veterans, and dependency and indemnity compensation for surviving spouses and children. The percentage increase in benefits shall be the same as the cost-of-living increase for Social Security recipients.
Title
Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] |
Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] |
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] |
Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-10 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1200 (Related) 2019-09-26 - Became Public Law No: 116-58. (TXT | PDF)
HB6168 (Related) 2020-10-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-178. (TXT | PDF)
SB4579 (Related) 2020-09-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB6168 (Related) 2020-10-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-178. (TXT | PDF)
SB4579 (Related) 2020-09-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Disability assistance
Inflation and prices
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Disability assistance
Inflation and prices
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/2072/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s2072/BILLS-116s2072is.pdf |