US SB209 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

PROGRESS for Indian Tribes Act Practical Reforms and Other Goals To Reinforce the Effectiveness of Self-Governance and Self-Determination for Indian Tribes Act of 2019 This bill replaces the Tribal Self-Governance Demonstration Project with the Tribal Self-Governance Program. Under the program, Native American tribes or organizations may receive grants to plan for participation in self-governance and to negotiate the terms of participation. In addition, the bill revises the Department of the Interior's process for approving self-governance compacts and funding agreements with tribes. Interior must negotiate contracts and funding agreements to maximize implementation of the self-governance policy. The bill sets forth requirements for tribes participating in self-governance with respect to conflicts of interest, audits, redesign and consolidation of programs, retrocession of programs, non-duplication of funding, and records. Funding agreements must include provisions for Interior to monitor the performance of trust functions by the tribe and to reassume a program and funding under specified circumstances. Tribes participating in self-governance may elect to assume some federal responsibilities with respect to certain construction projects. The bill prohibits obligating a tribe to continue performance of a compact or funding agreement that provides insufficient funding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROGRESS for Indian Tribes Act Practical Reforms and Other Goals To Reinforce the Effectiveness of Self-Governance and Self-Determination for Indian Tribes Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-21HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-09-21HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4550-4556)
2020-09-21HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 209.
2020-09-21HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4549-4557)
2020-09-21HouseMs. Haaland moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2020-05-22HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 338.
2020-05-22HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-422.
2019-12-05HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 10.
2019-12-05HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-12-05HouseSubcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Discharged.
2019-07-03HouseReferred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
2019-06-28HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-06-28HouseReceived in the House.
2019-06-28SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-06-27SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S4652-4664; text: CR S4653-4660)
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 73.
2019-04-29SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 116-34.
2019-01-29SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2019-01-24SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB2031 (Same As) 2019-07-16 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback