US SB2095 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-24 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 267.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-24 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 267.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide for certain programs and developments in the Department of Energy concerning the cybersecurity and vulnerabilities of, and physical threat to, the electric grid, and for other purposes.
Title
Enhancing Grid Security through Public-Private Partnerships Act
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 267. |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 116-147. |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB359 (Related) 2020-09-30 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 559.
Subjects
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Public utilities and utility rates
Public-private cooperation
Congressional oversight
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Public utilities and utility rates
Public-private cooperation