US SB2096 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to authorize States and tribal organizations that receive grants from the National Cemetery Administration for establishment, expansion, or improvement of a veterans' cemeteries to use amounts of such grants for State and tribal organization cemetery personnel to train at the training center of the National Cemetery Administration, and for other purposes.
Title
A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to authorize States and tribal organizations that receive grants from the National Cemetery Administration for establishment, expansion, or improvement of a veterans' cemeteries to use amounts of such grants for State and tribal organization cemetery personnel to train at the training center of the National Cemetery Administration, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2019-12-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-12-23 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-12-23 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text: CR S7232) |
2019-12-19 | Senate | S.Amdt.1272 Amendment SA 1272 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | S.Amdt.1272 Amendment SA 1272 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Boozman. (consideration: CR S7232; text: CR S7232) In the nature of a substitute. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7231-7232) |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Cemeteries and funerals
Employment and training programs
State and local government operations
Transportation costs
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Cemeteries and funerals
Employment and training programs
State and local government operations
Transportation costs
Veterans' organizations and recognition