US SB2099 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Redesignates the Sullys Hill National Game Preserve in North Dakota as the "White Horse Hill National Game Preserve."
Title
White Horse Hill National Game Preserve Designation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-11-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-11-18 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6613; text: CR S6613-6614) |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 223. |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso without amendment. Without written report. |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3755 (Same As) 2019-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
HB1865 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-94. (TXT | PDF)
HB1865 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-94. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
North Dakota
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection