US SB2103 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S4809)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S4809)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the continued review and approval, as appropriate, of certain pending applications for generic insulin beyond the March 23, 2020, cutoff date previously established by the Food and Drug Administration. Beginning March 23, 2020, these approved generic insulin drugs also are deemed licensed biological products.
Title
Affordable Insulin Approvals Now Act
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] |
Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Mitt Romney [R-UT] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] |
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] |
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S4809) |
Same As/Similar To
HB5444 (Related) 2019-12-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6155 (Related) 2020-03-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB6155 (Related) 2020-03-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Subjects
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug therapy
Health
Licensing and registrations
Prescription drugs
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug therapy
Health
Licensing and registrations
Prescription drugs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/2103/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s2103/BILLS-116s2103is.pdf |