US SB2107 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Became Public Law No: 116-122. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Became Public Law No: 116-122. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP), every fiscal year, to hire, train, and assign 240 new agricultural specialists until the total number of specialists equals and sustains the requirements identified each year in the Agriculture Resource Allocation Model. The CBP may also hire, train, and assign support staff to assist the specialists and specified levels of agricultural canine teams. In calculating the number of specialists needed at each port of entry through the Agriculture Resource Allocation Model, the Office of Field Operations of the CBP must (1) rely on data collected regarding the inspections and other activities conducted at each such port of entry; and (2) consider volume from seasonal surges, other projected changes in commercial and passenger volumes, the most current commercial forecasts, and other relevant information. The Government Accountability Office (GAO) must conduct a review of the efforts of the Department of Homeland Security, the Department of Agriculture, and other federal agencies to address risks to the agricultural supply. The GAO must analyze (1) interagency coordination and the distribution of responsibilities among federal agencies with respect to the inspection of agricultural commodities entering the United States; (2) the effectiveness of such inspection responsibilities among federal agencies; and (3) the training provided to, and working conditions of, CBP Agriculture Specialists.
Title
Protecting America's Food and Agriculture Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-122. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-02-10 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-02-10 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H983) |
2020-02-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2107. |
2020-02-10 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H983-986) |
2020-02-10 | House | Ms. Torres Small (NM) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-11-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations. |
2019-10-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-28 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6176-6177; text: CR S6177) |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 198. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 116-94. |
2019-07-24 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4482 (Same As) 2019-10-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations.
Subjects
Agricultural trade
Agriculture and food
Congressional oversight
Customs enforcement
Department of Homeland Security
Employee hiring
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Mammals
Service animals
Agriculture and food
Congressional oversight
Customs enforcement
Department of Homeland Security
Employee hiring
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Mammals
Service animals