US SB211 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 84.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 84.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Justice's Office for Victims of Crime to make grants to Native American tribes for programs and services for crime victims, such as domestic violence shelters, rape crisis centers, child abuse programs, child advocacy centers, elder abuse programs, medical care, legal services, relocation, and transitional housing. In addition, the bill makes 5% of the Crime Victims Fund available for these grants.
Title
SURVIVE Act Securing Urgent Resources Vital to Indian Victim Empowerment Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] |
Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 84. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 116-40. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1351 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB2920 (Related) 2019-11-21 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 308.
SB2920 (Related) 2019-11-21 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 308.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Aging
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Department of Justice
Domestic violence and child abuse
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Evidence and witnesses
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
HIV/AIDS
Indian social and development programs
Law enforcement administration and funding
Lawyers and legal services
Mental health
Minority health
Native Americans
Right of privacy
Sex offenses
Aging
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Department of Justice
Domestic violence and child abuse
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Evidence and witnesses
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
HIV/AIDS
Indian social and development programs
Law enforcement administration and funding
Lawyers and legal services
Mental health
Minority health
Native Americans
Right of privacy
Sex offenses