US SB2117 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on July 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Restricts the Department of Commerce from removing Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd. (Huawei) from the list of entities subject to license requirements for exports. Commerce may remove Huawei from the list only after certifying to Congress that (1) Huawei has neither violated U.S. or U.N. sanctions for five years nor stolen U.S. intellectual property during that time, and (2) Huawei poses no ongoing threat to U.S. telecommunications or infrastructure or the infrastructure of U.S. allies.
Title
Huawei Prohibition Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Mitt Romney [R-UT] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Alliances
Asia
China
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Foreign and international corporations
Foreign trade and international finance
Infrastructure development
Intellectual property
Licensing and registrations
Sanctions
Telephone and wireless communication
Trade restrictions
Asia
China
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Foreign and international corporations
Foreign trade and international finance
Infrastructure development
Intellectual property
Licensing and registrations
Sanctions
Telephone and wireless communication
Trade restrictions
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/2117/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s2117/BILLS-116s2117is.pdf |