US SB212 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Pending: House Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Indian Community Economic Enhancement Act of 2019 This bill makes several revisions related to economic development for Native American communities. (Sec. 3) Specifically, the bill establishes duties for the Office of Native American Business Development, including (1) advising the Department of Commerce regarding the relationship between the United States and Indian tribes; and (2) serving as the point of contact for tribes, tribal organizations, and members of tribes regarding economic development and doing business in Indian lands. The bill also requires coordination between Commerce, the Department of the Interior, and the Department of the Treasury to support economic development in Native American communities. Under the bill, assistance from the Community Development Financial Institutions Fund benefiting Native American institutions does not require matching funds. The Government Accountability Office must conduct a study that assesses (1) current programs and services that assist Native American communities with business and economic development; (2) assistance provided to Native Americans pursuant to loan, bond, and tax incentive programs; and (3) alternative incentives for tribal governments to invest in a Native American community development investment fund or bank. (Sec. 4) The bill requires the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to use Native American labor and purchase Native American industry products, unless Interior or HHS determines it would be impracticable and unreasonable to do so. Among other requirements, HHS and Interior must conduct outreach to Indian industrial entities in the implementation of enterprise development. (Sec. 5) Additionally, the bill authorizes the Administration for Native Americans (ANA) to provide financial assistance to Native American community development financial institutions. ANA must give priority for financial assistance to applicants whose programs seek to develop (1) tribal codes and court systems relating to economic development, (2) tribal business structures, (3) community development financial institutions, or (4) tribal master plans for community and economic development and infrastructure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Indian Community Economic Enhancement Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-03HouseReferred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
2019-06-28HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-28HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-28HouseReceived in the House.
2019-06-28SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-06-27SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text: CR S4650-4652)
2019-06-27SenateS.Amdt.905 Amendment SA 905 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2019-06-27SenateS.Amdt.905 Amendment SA 905 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Hoeven. (consideration: CR S4650; text: CR S4650) To improve the Indian Economic Development Feasibility Study.
2019-06-27SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4649-4652)
2019-04-08SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 63.
2019-04-08SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 116-28.
2019-01-29SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2019-01-24SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB1937 (Same As) 2019-04-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback