US SB2136 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to improve the ability of veterans to receive in-state tuition using educational assistance administered by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.
Title
A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to improve the ability of veterans to receive in-state tuition using educational assistance administered by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3608 (Related) 2019-07-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB2830 (Related) 2019-11-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB5278 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
SB4511 (Related) 2020-12-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 603.
HB7952 (Related) 2020-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB2830 (Related) 2019-11-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB5278 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
SB4511 (Related) 2020-12-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 603.
HB7952 (Related) 2020-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Educational facilities and institutions
Government information and archives
Higher education
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Educational facilities and institutions
Government information and archives
Higher education
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/2136/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s2136/BILLS-116s2136is.pdf |