US SB2159 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 244.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 244.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the Act that gave North Dakota jurisdiction over offenses committed by or against Indians on the Devils Lake Indian Reservation.
Title
A bill to repeal the Act entitled "An Act to confer jurisdiction on the State of North Dakota over offenses committed by or against Indians on the Devils Lake Indian Reservation".
Sponsors
Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 244. |
2019-10-16 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 116-130. |
2019-07-24 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-07-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3831 (Same As) 2019-08-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Subjects
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Federal-Indian relations
Jurisdiction and venue
Native Americans
North Dakota
State and local courts
Federal-Indian relations
Jurisdiction and venue
Native Americans
North Dakota
State and local courts