US SB216 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Pending: House Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Spokane Tribe of Indians of the Spokane Reservation Equitable Compensation Act This bill requires the Bonneville Power Administration to make specified settlement payments to the Spokane Tribe in relation to the construction and operation of the Grand Coulee Dam. Payments made to the tribe may be used or invested in the same manner as other tribal governmental funds. The initial payment extinguishes all monetary claims that the tribe may have against the United States to a fair share of the annual hydropower revenues generated by the Grand Coulee Dam.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Spokane Tribe of Indians of the Spokane Reservation Equitable Compensation Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-03HouseReferred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
2019-07-03HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
2019-06-28HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-06-28HouseReceived in the House.
2019-06-28SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-06-27SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S4652-4664; text: CR S4663-4664)
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 34.
2019-03-07SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 116-4.
2019-01-29SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2019-01-24SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback