US SB2165 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-18 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-18 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to enhance protections of Native American tangible cultural heritage, and for other purposes.
Title
Safeguard Tribal Objects of Patrimony Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] |
Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] |
Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] |
Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-18 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-12-18 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. |
2020-12-17 | Senate | The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7583-7586) |
2020-12-17 | Senate | S.Amdt.2712 Amendment SA 2712 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-12-17 | Senate | S.Amdt.2712 Amendment SA 2712 proposed by Senator Heinrich. (consideration: CR S7586; text: CR S7586) To modify certain penalties. |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7583-7586) |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 608. |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-308. |
2020-07-29 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. |
2019-07-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3846 (Same As) 2019-09-19 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Advisory bodies
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Archaeology and anthropology
Cemeteries and funerals
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Department of the Interior
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Federal-Indian relations
Government information and archives
Historical and cultural resources
Income tax deductions
International organizations and cooperation
Licensing and registrations
Native Americans
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Right of privacy
Smuggling and trafficking
User charges and fees
Advisory bodies
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Archaeology and anthropology
Cemeteries and funerals
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Department of the Interior
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Federal-Indian relations
Government information and archives
Historical and cultural resources
Income tax deductions
International organizations and cooperation
Licensing and registrations
Native Americans
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Right of privacy
Smuggling and trafficking
User charges and fees