US SB2204 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-21 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-21 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) to consider establishing a process for maintaining a list of numbers that are ineligible to be blocked by a voice service provider. These may include numbers used (1) for outgoing calls by a facility that is designated to originate or route emergency calls, (2) to originate calls from a government entity, or (3) by a school to provide school-related notifications. The FCC must submit a report containing an analysis of the effectiveness of various categories of call-blocking tools and any legislative recommendations relating to this report.
Title
DART Act of 2019 Data Analytics Robocall Technology Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-21 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-12-21 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-12-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-19 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7852-7853; text: CR S7852-7853) |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 585. |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-292. |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Subjects
Consumer affairs
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication