US SB2216 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Became Public Law No: 116-278.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Became Public Law No: 116-278.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
The bill revises the administration of Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) caregiver programs. Specifically, the bill requires the VA to formally recognize caregivers of veterans by identifying any caregiver in the electronic health record of the veteran. Such caregivers covered by the bill include those approved as a provider of personal care services under the Program of Comprehensive Assistance for Family Caregivers and those participating in the Program of General Caregiver Support Services. The bill requires the VA to use standardized letters to notify veterans, their caregivers, and applicants for the program regarding decisions affecting the furnishing of assistance under the Program of Comprehensive Assistance for Family Caregivers. The bill also authorizes the VA to temporarily extend benefits under the Program of Comprehensive Assistance for Family Caregivers, including the monthly personal caregiver stipend, after determining that a veteran is no longer clinically eligible for the program.
Title
TEAM Veteran Caregivers Act Transparency and Effective Accountability Measures for Veteran Caregivers Act
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-16 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 380 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 49) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-31 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-278. |
2020-12-31 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-12-21 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-12-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 380 - 0 (Roll no. 244). (text: CR H7211) |
2020-12-16 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7224-7225) |
2020-12-16 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2020-12-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2216. |
2020-12-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7211-7213) |
2020-12-16 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2020-11-18 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-11-18 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-11-17 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S7044-7045) |
2020-11-17 | Senate | S.Amdt.2688 Amendment SA 2688 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-11-17 | Senate | S.Amdt.2688 Amendment SA 2688 proposed by Senator Portman for Senator Peters. (consideration: CR S7044-7045; text: CR S7044-7045) In the nature of a substitute. |
2020-11-17 | Senate | The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. (CR S7044) |
2020-11-17 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7044-7045) |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 540. |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Moran with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report. |
2020-08-05 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6571 (Related) 2020-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Family services
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' medical care
Family services
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' medical care