US SB2227 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on July 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Decriminalizes marijuana. Specifically, it removes marijuana from the list of scheduled substances under the Controlled Substances Act and eliminates criminal penalties for an individual who manufactures, distributes, or possesses marijuana. The bill also makes other changes, including the following: replaces statutory references to marijuana and marihuana with cannabis, requires the Bureau of Labor Statistics to regularly publish demographic data on cannabis business owners and employees, establishes a trust fund to support various programs and services for individuals and businesses in communities impacted by the war on drugs, imposes a 5% tax on cannabis products and requires revenues to be deposited into the trust fund, makes Small Business Administration loans and services available to entities that are cannabis-related legitimate businesses or service providers, prohibits the denial of federal public benefits to a person on the basis of certain cannabis-related conduct or convictions, prohibits the denial of benefits and protections under immigration laws on the basis of a cannabis-related event (e.g., conduct or a conviction), and establishes a process to expunge convictions and conduct sentencing review hearings related to federal cannabis offenses.
Title
MORE Act of 2019 Marijuana Opportunity Reinvestment and Expungement Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] |
Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3884 (Same As) 2020-12-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3540 (Related) 2019-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB3543 (Related) 2019-06-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HB3544 (Related) 2019-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HR1244 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB3540 (Related) 2019-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB3543 (Related) 2019-06-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HB3544 (Related) 2019-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HR1244 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Adult education and literacy
Business records
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Department of Justice
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
Government trust funds
Immigration status and procedures
Judicial review and appeals
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Lawyers and legal services
Licensing and registrations
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Retail and wholesale trades
Sales and excise taxes
Small business
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Women in business
Administrative remedies
Adult education and literacy
Business records
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Department of Justice
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
Government trust funds
Immigration status and procedures
Judicial review and appeals
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Lawyers and legal services
Licensing and registrations
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Retail and wholesale trades
Sales and excise taxes
Small business
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Women in business
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/2227/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s2227/BILLS-116s2227is.pdf |