US SB2258 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 116-257.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 116-257.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits employers from retaliating against certain employees who report criminal antitrust violations to the federal government. Among other things, the bill sets forth provisions that authorize an employee to seek relief by filing a complaint with the Department of Labor or to bring an action in U.S. district court if the individual alleges discharge or other discrimination by an employer who violates the prohibition against retaliation.
Title
Criminal Antitrust Anti-Retaliation Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-257. |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-12-11 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-12-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-08 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7007-7008) |
2020-12-08 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2258. |
2020-12-08 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7007-7009) |
2020-12-08 | House | Mr. Neguse moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-10-21 | House | Held at the desk. |
2019-10-21 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-10-21 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5904-5905; text: CR S5904-5905) |
2019-07-25 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 163. |
2019-07-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
Same As/Similar To
HB8226 (Same As) 2020-09-11 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Civil actions and liability
Commerce
Competition and antitrust
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Civil actions and liability
Commerce
Competition and antitrust
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Employment discrimination and employee rights