US SB226 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 65.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 65.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the National Labor Relations Act (NLRA) to exclude Native American tribes and tribal enterprises and institutions on tribal land from requirements for employers under the NLRA. (Currently under the NLRA, employers may not engage in unfair labor practices and must allow employees to form unions, engage in collective bargaining, and take collective action.)
Title
Tribal Labor Sovereignty Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] |
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] |
Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 65. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 116-30. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB779 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SB2920 (Related) 2019-11-21 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 308.
SB2920 (Related) 2019-11-21 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 308.
Subjects
Federal-Indian relations
Indian lands and resources rights
Labor-management relations
Minority employment
Native Americans
Indian lands and resources rights
Labor-management relations
Minority employment
Native Americans