US SB2300 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-24 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 269.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

CIT Act of 2019 Clean Industrial Technology Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CIT Act of 2019 Clean Industrial Technology Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-24SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 269.
2019-10-24SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-148.
2019-09-25SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2019-09-11SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held.
2019-07-25SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Same As/Similar To

HB3978 (Related) 2019-07-25 - Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB4230 (Related) 2019-09-11 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback