US SB232 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires presidentially appointed executive branch officials to disclose whether they have solicited donations for or contributed funds to political action committees, political non-profits, or industry trade associations.
Title
Conflicts from Political Fundraising Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
HB812 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HR172 (Similar To) 2019-03-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB812 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HR172 (Similar To) 2019-03-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Federal officials
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government operations and politics
Office of Government Ethics
Public participation and lobbying
Congressional oversight
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Federal officials
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government operations and politics
Office of Government Ethics
Public participation and lobbying
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/232/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s232/BILLS-116s232is.pdf |