US SB2346 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-21 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-21 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises the review process for making fishery resource disaster determinations. Among other things, the bill maintains the authority of the Department of Commerce to determine the existence of a fishery disaster; sets forth requirements for initiating a request for a fishery resource disaster review; provides a 120-day time frame for Commerce to evaluate a request, beginning either upon receipt or at the close of the fishery season, if the fishery season closes; establishes criteria for Commerce to use when making a determination about whether a fishery resource disaster has occurred; lists eligible uses of fishery disaster relief funds, including for habitat conservation and restoration that reduce adverse impacts to a fishery; and adds additional reporting requirements related to U.S. fishery management.
Title
Fishery Failures: Urgently Needed Disaster Declarations Act
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-21 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-12-21 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-12-21 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S7878-7880) |
2020-12-20 | Senate | S.Amdt.2723 Amendment SA 2723 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-12-20 | Senate | S.Amdt.2723 Amendment SA 2723 proposed by Senator Blunt for Senator Wicker. (consideration: CR S7871; text: CR S7878-7880) In the nature of a substitute. |
2020-12-20 | Senate | The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-12-20 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7868-7871; text: CR S7868-7871) |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 586. |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-293. |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-07-30 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5548 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Subjects
Appropriations
Aquaculture
Disaster relief and insurance
Economic performance and conditions
Employment and training programs
Government information and archives
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Public lands and natural resources
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Aquaculture
Disaster relief and insurance
Economic performance and conditions
Employment and training programs
Government information and archives
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Public lands and natural resources
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection