US SB238 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 461.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 461.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Special Envoy for Monitoring and Combating anti-Semitism as an ambassador-rank official, appointed by the President, by and with the advice and consent of the Senate, who leads the Office to Monitor and Combat anti-Semitism within the Department of State. (Under current law, the special envoy is appointed by the Secretary of State.) The President may nominate the special envoy from among State Department officers and employees. The special envoy shall be the primary advisor in the government relating to monitoring and combating anti-Semitism in foreign countries and shall be of recognized distinction in combating anti-Semitism.
Title
Special Envoy to Monitor and Combat Anti-Semitism Act Special Envoy to Monitor and Combat Anti-Semitism Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] |
Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] |
Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 461. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB221 (Same As) 2021-01-13 - Became Public Law No: 116-326.
Subjects
Department of State
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Human rights
International affairs
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Human rights
International affairs
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion