US SB241 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 108.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 108.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cerros del Norte Conservation Act - Designates the Cerro del Yuta Wilderness and Rio San Antonio Wilderness within the Rio Grande del Norte National Monument in New Mexico as wilderness and as components of the National Wilderness Preservation System. Requires incorporation into the relevant wilderness area of any land or interests in land within the boundaries of such wilderness areas acquired by the United States. Sets forth requirements for the management of the wilderness areas regarding: (1) livestock grazing, (2) the creation of protective perimeters and buffer zones, and (3) the jurisdiction of the state of New Mexico respecting fish and wildlife located on public land in New Mexico. Releases specified public land within the San Antonio Wilderness Study Area not designated as wilderness by this Act from further study for such a designation. Requires the wilderness areas to be administered as components of the National Landscape Conservation System. Withdraws any federal land within the wilderness areas, including any acquired land or interest, from: (1) entry, appropriation, or disposal under the public land laws; (2) location, entry, and patent under the mining laws; and (3) operation of the mineral leasing, mineral materials, and geothermal leasing laws. Denies that anything in this Act enlarges, diminishes, or otherwise modifies any treaty rights.
Title
Cerros del Norte Conservation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 108. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Wyden with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 113-54. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 113-28. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB560 (Related) 2013-02-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Subjects
New Mexico
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats