US SB241 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the conservation of specified lands in Colorado. Specifically, the bill designates specified federal lands within the White River National Forest as components of the National Wilderness Preservation System, the proposed Williams Fork Wilderness as a potential wilderness area, the Tenmile Recreation Management Area, the Porcupine Gulch Wildlife Conservation Area, the Williams Fork Wildlife Conservation Area, the Camp Hale National Historic Landscape, the Sheep Mountain and Liberty Bell East Special Management Areas, and the Curecanti National Recreation Area. The bill adjusts the boundary of the White River National Forest, the Rocky Mountain National Park Wilderness, and the Arapaho National Forest. The bill directs the Department of Agriculture to permit by special use authorization nonmotorized access and use of the Bolts Ditch headgate and the Bolts Ditch within the Holy Cross Wilderness for the diversion of water and use, maintenance, and repair of the ditch and headgate by the town of Minturn. The bill provides for the inclusion of additional federal lands in the National Wilderness Preservation System. The bill provides for the cancellation of all Thompson Divide oil or gas leases. The Department of the Interior shall carry out a program to lease federal methane from coal mines leaking methane in the North Fork Valley.
Title
Colorado Outdoor Recreation and Economy Act
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-18 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB823 (Same As) 2020-11-18 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
HR656 (Similar To) 2019-10-29 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB474 (Related) 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
SB37 (Related) 2019-01-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HR656 (Similar To) 2019-10-29 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB474 (Related) 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
SB37 (Related) 2019-01-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Animal and plant health
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Coal
Colorado
Dams and canals
Electric power generation and transmission
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Fires
Forests, forestry, trees
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Hunting and fishing
Infrastructure development
Insects
Intergovernmental relations
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Livestock
Mining
Motor vehicles
Oil and gas
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Pedestrians and bicycling
Public lands and natural resources
Roads and highways
Water storage
Water use and supply
Watersheds
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Animal and plant health
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Coal
Colorado
Dams and canals
Electric power generation and transmission
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Fires
Forests, forestry, trees
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Hunting and fishing
Infrastructure development
Insects
Intergovernmental relations
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Livestock
Mining
Motor vehicles
Oil and gas
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Pedestrians and bicycling
Public lands and natural resources
Roads and highways
Water storage
Water use and supply
Watersheds
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/241/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s241/BILLS-116s241is.pdf |