US SB2413 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on August 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Trade Certainty Act of 2019 This bill limits the President's authority to use emergency economic powers to impose duties or tariffs on items entering the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trade Certainty Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-01SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Same As/Similar To

HB3557 (Related) 2019-06-27 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB8363 (Related) 2020-09-23 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, the Budget, Transportation and Infrastructure, Rules, Foreign Affairs, Ways and Means, Intelligence (Permanent Select), and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4880 (Related) 2020-10-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback