US SB2425 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 116-209.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 116-209.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Redesignates the Department of Energy's Clean Energy Application Centers as the CHP Technical Assistance Partnership Program and reauthorizes the program through FY2024. The program encourages deployment of combined heat and power, heat to power, and efficient district energy technologies. The program also provides project specific support to building and industrial professionals through economic and engineering assessments and advisory activities.
Title
CHP Support Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Senate | By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 116-209. |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 354. |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with amendments. Without written report. |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held. |
2019-08-01 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1480 (Related) 2019-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Subjects
Building construction
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Lighting, heating, cooling
Manufacturing
Public-private cooperation
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Lighting, heating, cooling
Manufacturing
Public-private cooperation