US SB2502 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 547.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 547.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bans the procurement or use by the federal government of commercial off-the-shelf drones or other unmanned aircraft systems manufactured or assembled by certain entities, including entities subject to influence or control by China, with exceptions. Federal funds may not be used to purchase or operate such a drone or system, or a system to counter unmanned aircraft systems, that is manufactured or assembled by such an entity. The Government Accountability Office shall report regarding such drones or systems procured by federal agencies from foreign entities.
Title
American Security Drone Act of 2019 American Security Drone Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 547. |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-268. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-09-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5125 (Same As) 2019-11-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Asia
Aviation and airports
China
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Foreign and international corporations
Government operations and politics
Homeland security
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Public contracts and procurement
Asia
Aviation and airports
China
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Foreign and international corporations
Government operations and politics
Homeland security
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Public contracts and procurement