US SB2507 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a nonimmigrant visa for qualified Canadian citizens. The Department of Homeland Security may admit as a visitor a Canadian citizen who (1) is at least 50 years old, (2) maintains a residence in Canada, (3) owns a U.S. residence or has signed a rental agreement for the duration of the stay, (4) is not inadmissible or deportable under various provisions, (5) will not engage in U.S. employment except for services for the visitor's employer in Canada, and (6) will not seek U.S. assistance or benefits. Such visitors may be admitted for up to 240 days out of any single 365-day period.
Title
Canadian Snowbirds Act
Sponsors
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2187 (Related) 2019-05-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB3241 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB4498 (Related) 2019-10-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB3241 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB4498 (Related) 2019-10-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Subjects
Canada
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Travel and tourism
Visas and passports
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Travel and tourism
Visas and passports
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/2507/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s2507/BILLS-116s2507is.pdf |