US SB2510 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows a refundable tax credit for elementary or secondary school teachers or early childhood educators in schools with a certain poverty rate, increases the tax deduction for the expenses of elementary and secondary school teachers, and provides funding for local educational agencies that maintain or increase teacher salaries.
Title
RAISE Act Respect, Advancement, and Increasing Support for Educators Act
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-19 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5352 (Related) 2019-12-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB878 (Related) 2019-01-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5377 (Related) 2020-01-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB878 (Related) 2019-01-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5377 (Related) 2020-01-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Education of the disadvantaged
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Inflation and prices
Labor-management relations
Preschool education
Taxation
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Wages and earnings
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Inflation and prices
Labor-management relations
Preschool education
Taxation
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/2510/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s2510/BILLS-116s2510is.pdf |