US SB2517 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on September 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text: CR S5605-5606)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text: CR S5605-5606)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide tax rate parity among all tobacco products, and for other purposes.
Title
Tobacco Tax Equity Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-19 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text: CR S5605-5606) |
Same As/Similar To
HB293 (Similar To) 2019-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1897 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4425 (Related) 2019-09-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB916 (Related) 2019-10-29 - S.Amdt.1240 Referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8200 (Related) 2020-09-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
HB1897 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4425 (Related) 2019-09-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB916 (Related) 2019-10-29 - S.Amdt.1240 Referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8200 (Related) 2020-09-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/2517/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s2517/BILLS-116s2517is.pdf |