US SB252 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-06 - Became Public Law No: 116-11. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-06 - Became Public Law No: 116-11. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the honorary appointment of Robert J. Dole, of Kansas, to the grade of colonel in the regular Army.
Title
A bill to authorize the honorary appointment of Robert J. Dole to the grade of colonel in the regular Army.
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-06 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-11. (TXT | PDF) |
2019-04-06 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2019-03-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-03-26 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H2817-2818) |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: H2817-2818) |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee on Armed Services discharged. |
2019-03-26 | House | Mr. Cisneros asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2019-03-05 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S1633-1634) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Armed Services discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1633-1634) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. |