US SB253 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 207.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Streamlining Energy Efficiency for Schools Act This bill requires the Office of Energy Efficiency and Renewable Energy to act as the lead federal agency for coordinating and disseminating information on existing federal programs that support energy efficiency, renewable energy, and energy retrofitting projects for schools. The bill also outlines the requirements for such coordination and outreach. Specifically, the office must: review such programs and financing mechanisms for such projects; establish a federal cross-departmental collaborative coordination, education, and outreach effort to communicate about such programs; provide technical assistance for states, local educational agencies, and schools to help develop and finance projects; develop and maintain a single online resource website with contact information for relevant technical assistance and support staff in the office; and establish a process to recognize schools that have successfully implemented such projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Streamlining Energy Efficiency for Schools Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-19SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 207.
2019-09-19SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with amendments. With written report No. 116-107.
2019-07-16SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
2019-01-29SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Same As/Similar To

SB2137 (Related) 2019-10-23 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 263.
HB3962 (Related) 2019-07-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
HB762 (Related) 2019-09-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 208.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback