US SB2543 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prescription Drug Pricing Reduction Act of 2019 This bill alters several programs and requirements relating to the prices of prescription drugs under Medicare and Medicaid. Among other things, the bill requires drug manufacturers to issue rebates to the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS) for certain drugs covered under Medicare for which the average manufacturer price increases faster than inflation; requires drug manufacturers to issue rebates to the CMS for discarded amounts of certain single-dose drugs covered under Medicare, based on information reported by providers; reduces the annual out-of-pocket spending threshold, and eliminates beneficiary cost-sharing above this threshold, under the Medicare prescription drug benefit; requires the CMS to publish certain information, as reported by pharmacy benefit managers (PBMs), relating to drug discounts and rebates, and payments between PBMs, health plans, and pharmacies; requires pass-through pricing models, and prohibits spread-pricing, for payment arrangements with PBMs under Medicaid; and increases the maximum rebate payable by drug manufacturers under the Medicaid Drug Rebate Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescription Drug Pricing Reduction Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-25SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 225.
2019-09-25SenateCommittee on Finance. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Grassley. With written report No. 116-120.

Same As/Similar To

HB1264 (Related) 2019-02-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1781 (Related) 2019-10-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3029 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
SB801 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1999 (Related) 2019-06-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4629 (Related) 2019-10-18 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8232)
HB4649 (Related) 2019-10-30 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8607)
HB5281 (Related) 2019-12-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback