US SB2547 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
States that it is U.S. policy to (1) expand alliances and partnerships in the Indo-Pacific region and Europe to develop a unified approach to addressing the diplomatic, economic, and military challenges posed by China; and (2) promote democracy and human rights in partnership with like-minded countries.
Title
Indo-Pacific Cooperation Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Mitt Romney [R-UT] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2020-01-15 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S200) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S199-200) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | S.Amdt.1282 Amendment SA 1282 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | S.Amdt.1282 Amendment SA 1282 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Romney. (consideration: CR S200; text: CR S200) To modify a finding relating to the defense strategy of the United States. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S199-200) |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 363. |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Subjects
Alliances
Asia
China
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Europe
Foreign aid and international relief
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military operations and strategy
Asia
China
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Europe
Foreign aid and international relief
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military operations and strategy