US SB2560 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 436.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 436.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires federal agencies to make budget justification materials available to the public. The bill also requires the Office of Management and Budget to make certain details regarding the materials available to the public, including a list of the agencies that submit budget justification materials to Congress, the dates that the materials are submitted to Congress and posted online, and links to the materials.
Title
Congressional Budget Justification Transparency Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 436. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment. With written report No. 116-221. |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-09-26 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4894 (Related) 2020-09-15 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 533.
HB5150 (Related) 2019-12-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
HB5150 (Related) 2019-12-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Subjects
Appropriations
Budget process
Congressional oversight
Economics and public finance
Executive agency funding and structure
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Budget process
Congressional oversight
Economics and public finance
Executive agency funding and structure
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives