US SB2563 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Water Supply Infrastructure and Drought Resilience Act of 2018
Title
Water Supply Infrastructure and Drought Resilience Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ] | Sen. John McCain [R-AZ] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] |
Sen. James Risch [R-ID] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB660 (Related) 2018-09-17 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 573.
HB1654 (Related) 2017-06-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB216 (Related) 2017-06-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 127.
SB677 (Related) 2017-06-14 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 115-38.
SB2166 (Related) 2018-11-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 660.
HB5726 (Related) 2018-05-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
HB1654 (Related) 2017-06-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB216 (Related) 2017-06-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 127.
SB677 (Related) 2017-06-14 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 115-38.
SB2166 (Related) 2018-11-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 660.
HB5726 (Related) 2018-05-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Subjects
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Congressional oversight
Department of the Interior
Executive agency funding and structure
Floods and storm protection
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Hydrology and hydrography
Indian lands and resources rights
State and local government operations
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water storage
Water use and supply
Watersheds
Congressional oversight
Department of the Interior
Executive agency funding and structure
Floods and storm protection
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Hydrology and hydrography
Indian lands and resources rights
State and local government operations
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water storage
Water use and supply
Watersheds
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/2563/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s2563/BILLS-115s2563is.pdf |