US SB2563 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

ILLICIT CASH Act Improving Laundering Laws and Increasing Comprehensive Information Tracking of Criminal Activity in Shell Holdings Act This bill expands disclosure requirements regarding the ownership of corporations and sets forth additional requirements regarding anti-money laundering and combating the financing of terrorism programs (known as AML-CFT programs). Corporations must disclose their beneficial owners to the Financial Crimes Enforcement Network (FinCEN). The bill defines a beneficial owner as an individual who (1) exercises substantial control over a corporation or limited liability company, (2) owns 25% or more of the interest in a corporation or limited liability company, or (3) receives substantial economic benefits from the assets of a corporation or limited liability company. The bill also generally expands and revises existing AML-CFT provisions, including by compelling foreign banks to comply with subpoenas for records and allowing fines for foreign banks that fail to comply, establishing a financial institution liaison at FinCEN, initiating a review of thresholds for currency transaction reports and suspicious activity reports, and expanding the regulation of digital currencies. The bill also requires increased communication and data sharing between law enforcement, financial regulators, and financial institutions. The bill provides statutory authority for the Securities and Exchange Commission to seek disgorgement (i.e., repayment) as a remedy for unjust enrichment that a person gained through a securities law violation. The bill also revises administrative requirements of FinCEN, including by revising the pay scale of employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ILLICIT CASH Act Improving Laundering Laws and Increasing Comprehensive Information Tracking of Criminal Activity in Shell Holdings Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30SenateCommittee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
2019-12-05SenateCommittee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
2019-09-26SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB502 (Related) 2019-01-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB758 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB1039 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB1414 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB410 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB582 (Related) 2019-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB799 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB1592 (Related) 2019-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback